NY A00815 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.
Title
Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | vetoed memo.100 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1496 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1389A |
2022-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 815a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.52 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.38 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01389 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A815A