NY A00881 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - amended on third reading 881a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - amended on third reading 881a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report evaluating public employers wage disparities related to the job titles segregated by the gender, race and/or national origin of the employees in the title.
Title
Directs the president of the civil service commission to study and publish a report evaluating public employers wage disparities related to the job titles segregated by the gender, race and/or national origin of the employees in the title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 881a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.53 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.81 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05391 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 5391A