NY A00985 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes certain deputy sheriffs from Monroe county as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes certain deputy sheriffs from Monroe county as peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.327
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1980
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8916
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.975
2018-05-31Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-01-10Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S08916 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A985

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback