NY A00992 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - substituted by s830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - substituted by s830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to window coverings required in child day care centers; requires child day care centers to ensure that all window and door blind cords, ropes, wires and other strangulation hazards are secured and inaccessible to children in accordance with the regulations of the office of children and family services.
Title
Relates to window coverings required in child day care centers; requires child day care centers to ensure that all window and door blind cords, ropes, wires and other strangulation hazards are secured and inaccessible to children in accordance with the regulations of the office of children and family services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Assembly | substituted by s830 |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.84 |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.84 |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S00830 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.80