NY A01068 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - print number 1068a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - print number 1068a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state YouthBuild act"; sets program requirements; authorizes the commissioner of education to make grants to eligible YouthBuild programs and to establish application requirements; expands the number of YouthBuild programs in New York state; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Enacts the "New York state YouthBuild act"; sets program requirements; authorizes the commissioner of education to make grants to eligible YouthBuild programs and to establish application requirements; expands the number of YouthBuild programs in New York state; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Assembly | print number 1068a |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05919 (Same As) 2014-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5919B