NY A01072 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.416
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the continuance of unemployment benefits for an individual who provides child care where reasonable efforts to secure alternative child care have been made.
Title
Relates to the continuance of unemployment benefits for an individual who provides child care where reasonable efforts to secure alternative child care have been made.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.416 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06120 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE