NY A01090 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To provide an incentive and protection program for volunteer firefighters and ambulance workers.
Title
An act to amend the tax law, the vehicle and traffic law, the general municipal law, the labor law, the public health law, the volunteer firefighters' benefit law, the volunteer ambulance workers' benefit law, the county law and the education law, in relation to enacting the volunteer firefighter and ambulance worker protection and incentive act of 2007; and to amend chapter 668 of the laws of 1977, amending the volunteer firefighters' benefit law, relating to disability due to disease or malfunction of the heart or coronary arteries, in relation to making certain provisions thereof permanent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | held for consideration in ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-04-06 | motion to discharge lost | |
2009-01-07 | referred to ways and means |