NY A01206 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to use of personal confidential information received from veterans or family members of veterans receiving services from the state and political subdivisions thereof.
Title
Relates to use of personal confidential information received from veterans or family members of veterans receiving services from the state and political subdivisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Senate | signed chap.322 |
2018-10-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1762 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6610 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.82 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.65 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S06610 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1206