NY A01339 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires applicants for all-night liquor licenses to notify local community boards of their intent to apply for such licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires applicants for all-night liquor licenses to notify local community boards of their intent to apply for such licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.396
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1661
2018-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4415
2018-01-23SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-01-23Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.90
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.317
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-01-11Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S04415 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1339

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback