NY A01517 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.243
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.243
Summary
To authorize the county of Albany to increase the enhanced 911 emergency telephone system surcharge to 30 cents.
Title
An act to amend the county law, in relation to establishing a wireless surcharge for Albany county
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | substituted by s548 | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.424 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-04-21 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00548 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.243
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01517&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |