NY S00548 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.243
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.243
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of a wireless surcharge for Albany county.
Title
Authorizes the establishment of a wireless surcharge for Albany county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | SIGNED CHAP.243 | |
2009-07-17 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-02 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-02 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-02 | home rule request | |
2009-06-02 | ordered to third reading cal.424 | |
2009-06-02 | substituted for a1517 | |
2009-05-05 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-05 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-05 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-05 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-04-27 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-04-22 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-04-21 | 1ST REPORT CAL.185 | |
2009-03-11 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-07 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01517 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.243
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00548&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |