NY A01571 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to distinctive "Appalachian Trail" license plates.
Title
Relates to distinctive "Appalachian Trail" license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.109 |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1484 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5431A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.278 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.278 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | print number 1571b |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | print number 1571a |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05431 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1571B