NY A01605 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of possible conflicts; provides for the vacating of an arbitration award on the ground that the arbitrator was affiliated in any way with any party, or has a financial interest directly or indirectly in any party or in the outcome of the arbitration.
Title
Requires disclosure of possible conflicts; provides for the vacating of an arbitration award on the ground that the arbitrator was affiliated in any way with any party, or has a financial interest directly or indirectly in any party or in the outcome of the arbitration.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.80 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.293 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.293 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02100 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY