NY A01677 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s2008b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s2008b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specification between partial approval of medical claims or payments and full denial of medical claims or payments on written notices to an insurer or an organization or corporation licensed or certified.
Title
Requires specification between partial approval of medical claims or payments and full denial of medical claims or payments on written notices to an insurer or an organization or corporation licensed or certified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s2008b |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.163 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | print number 1677a |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02008 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.694