NY A01722 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s1381a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s1381a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a proposed amendment to the constitution or other question provided by law to be submitted to a statewide vote be submitted to the people for their approval in plain language which is deemed to be no higher than an eighth grade reading level.
Title
Requires a proposed amendment to the constitution or other question provided by law to be submitted to a statewide vote be submitted to the people for their approval in plain language which is deemed to be no higher than an eighth grade reading level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s1381a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.681 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1722b |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | print number 1722a |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01381 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.648