NY A01906 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.574
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disposal in a solid waste facility of lamps containing mercury; requires manufacturers thereof to establish collection and recycling programs.
Title
Prohibits the disposal in a solid waste facility of lamps containing mercury; requires manufacturers thereof to establish collection and recycling programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.574 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.65 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00890 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION