NY A01909 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - signed chap.634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - signed chap.634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exempting certain non-profit community gardens from payment for water usage and supply; exempts non-profit community gardens located on property in the city of New York and registered with and licensed by such city's department of parks and recreation from payment for water usage and supply.
Title
Relates to exempting certain non-profit community gardens from payment for water usage and supply; exempts non-profit community gardens located on property in the city of New York and registered with and licensed by such city's department of parks and recreation from payment for water usage and supply.
Sponsors
Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Steven Raga [D] |
Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | signed chap.634 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1797 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1082 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.210 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.210 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S01082 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1909