NY A01933 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the installation or use of solar power systems within a homeowners' association.
Title
Relates to the installation or use of solar power systems within a homeowners' association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted by s2997 |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.123 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02997 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.342