NY A01966 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-6)
Status: Vetoed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - VETOED MEMO.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - VETOED MEMO.259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the state office of the utility consumer advocate to represent interests of residential utility customers.
Title
Creates the state office of the utility consumer advocate to represent interests of residential utility customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.259 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a1966 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.863 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4399 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.487 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04399 (Same As) 2019-12-26 - VETOED MEMO.259