NY A02079 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to appropriation and apportionment of moneys for the promotion of agriculture and domestic arts in the county of Orange.
Title
Relates to appropriation and apportionment of moneys for the promotion of agriculture and domestic arts in the county of Orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.600 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.585 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a2079 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1194 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5510 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.585 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.585 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05510 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.600