NY A02107 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the collection of rent arrearages accruing prior to the date of approval of an application for an adjustment in the legal regulated rent based upon a major capital improvement.
Title
Prohibits the collection of rent arrearages accruing prior to the date of approval of an application for an adjustment in the legal regulated rent based upon a major capital improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | recommitted to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.156 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.495 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | print number 2107a |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05945 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT