NY A02118 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to individuals with disabilities being able to terminate their leases when moving to a residence of a family member or entering certain facilities.
Title
Relates to individuals with disabilities being able to terminate their leases when moving to a residence of a family member or entering certain facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.320 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.494 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3891 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.182 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03891 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - signed chap.320