NY A02290 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s724a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s724a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the sale and possession of sparkling devices outside of cities with a population of one million or more; removes requirement that localities authorize sparkling devices in their jurisdictions; authorizes counties to opt out if they pass a local law.
Title
Relates to authorizing the sale and possession of sparkling devices outside of cities with a population of one million or more; removes requirement that localities authorize sparkling devices in their jurisdictions; authorizes counties to opt out if they pass a local law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s724a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.323 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | print number 2290c |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | print number 2290b |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 2290a |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00724 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.371