NY A02420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the disclosure of personally identifiable information by an internet service provider without the express written approval of the consumer.
Title
Prohibits the disclosure of personally identifiable information by an internet service provider without the express written approval of the consumer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.103 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.333 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.333 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00518 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION