NY A02430 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2430a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.113 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.75 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.75 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03185 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 3185A