NY A02477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - substituted by s5343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos by aerial application by January 1, 2020; prohibits all use except for apple tree trunks by January 1, 2021 and prohibits any use of chlorpyrifos by December 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos by aerial application by January 1, 2020; prohibits all use except for apple tree trunks by January 1, 2021 and prohibits any use of chlorpyrifos by December 1, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30Assemblysubstituted by s5343
2019-04-29Assemblyamended on third reading 2477b
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.186
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-21Assemblyprint number 2477a
2019-03-21Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02156 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S05343 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02477
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02477A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02477B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02477&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback