NY S02156 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-25SenateAMENDED 2156A
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.310
2019-01-22SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A02477 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - substituted by s5343

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback