NY A02536 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an alternative energy systems and generating equipment tax credit for qualified expenditures meeting the criteria prescribed by the department of taxation and finance, in consultation with the department of environmental conservation and the New York state energy research and development authority, for taxpayers subject to tax under articles nine-A, twenty-two, thirty-two and thirty-three of the tax law whose business is not substantially engaged in the commercial generation, distribution, transmission or servicing of energy or energy products.
Title
Establishes an alternative energy systems and generating equipment tax credit for qualified expenditures meeting the criteria prescribed by the department of taxation and finance, in consultation with the department of environmental conservation and the New York state energy research and development authority, for taxpayers subject to tax under articles nine-A, twenty-two, thirty-two and thirty-three of the tax law whose business is not substantially engaged in the commercial generation, distribution, transmission or servicing of energy or energy products.
Sponsors
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Thomas McKevitt [R] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | print number 2536a |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |