NY A02792 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - substituted by s4648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - substituted by s4648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of Native American affairs to act as a centralized office for Native American nations to access information on state programs that are provided to Native Americans.
Title
Establishes the office of Native American affairs to act as a centralized office for Native American nations to access information on state programs that are provided to Native Americans.
Sponsors
Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] |
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s4648 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.334 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04648 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.77