NY A02794 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - print number 2794b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires medical assistance coverage for medically tailored meals and medical nutrition therapy for the purpose of disease management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires medical assistance coverage for medically tailored meals and medical nutrition therapy for the purpose of disease management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Assemblyprint number 2794b
2019-03-11Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-03-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-01Assemblyprint number 2794a
2019-02-01Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03458 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - PRINT NUMBER 3458A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback