NY A02805 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers and veterans; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers and veterans; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senateapproval memo.8
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.398
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1828
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3804
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2018-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.224
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-24SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2017-05-24Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-24Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.396
2017-05-16Assemblyreported
2017-05-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-23Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S03804 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2805

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02805&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02805&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02805
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02805&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02805&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02805&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2805#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback