NY S03804 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2805
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers and veterans; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.
Title
Establishes entrepreneurship assistance centers to provide assistance to primarily minority group members, women, individuals with a disability and dislocated workers and veterans; requires the department of economic development to establish criteria and designation of such centers; sets forth requirements for each center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2805 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1828 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A02805 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - approval memo.8