NY A02806 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an individual to attest by signature that they are the true owner of the property being sold.
Title
Requires an individual to attest by signature that they are the true owner of the property being sold.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | print number 2806a |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | referred to economic development |