NY A02918 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of St. Lawrence county economic development power that may be used by the New York Power Authority to generate net earnings and authority-TMED contracts.
Title
Relates to the amount of St. Lawrence county economic development power that may be used by the New York Power Authority to generate net earnings and authority-TMED contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | print number 2918b |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | print number 2918a |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S04876 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS