NY S04876 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of St. Lawrence county economic development power that may be used by the New York Power Authority to generate net earnings and authority-TMED contracts.
Title
Relates to the amount of St. Lawrence county economic development power that may be used by the New York Power Authority to generate net earnings and authority-TMED contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4876A |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.876 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02918 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to energy