NY A03241 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Title
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.90 |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.166 |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06652 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH