NY A03276 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - print number 3276b
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - print number 3276b
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "behavioral health services for veterans act".
Title
Enacts the "behavioral health services for veterans act".
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Assembly | print number 3276b |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 3276a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S05859 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5859B