NY A03416 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-03 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The primary purpose of this legis- lation is to establish a half holiday that commemorates Harriet Tubman, her life achievements and her pivotal role in the "Underground Rail- road". The legislation will designate the second Saturday of March of each year, to be known as Harriet Tubman Day.
Title
Designates the tenth day of March of each year as a public holiday, to be known as Harriet Tubman day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | held for consideration in judiciary | |
2010-02-25 | print number 3416b | |
2010-02-25 | amend and recommit to judiciary | |
2010-01-06 | referred to judiciary | |
2009-11-19 | print number 3416a | |
2009-11-19 | amend and recommit to judiciary | |
2009-01-27 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S4027 (Same As) 2010-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE