NY A03477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the legislative task force on responsible gaming to develop policies and procedures that foster responsible gaming practices by gaming facilities in New York state.
Title
Establishes the legislative task force on responsible gaming to develop policies and procedures that foster responsible gaming practices by gaming facilities in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.158 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.401 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a3477a |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1978A |
2019-03-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-11 | Senate | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.63 |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s1978a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.401 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | print number 3477a |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S01978 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.158