NY S01978 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the legislative task force on responsible gaming to develop policies and procedures that foster responsible gaming practices by gaming facilities in New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the legislative task force on responsible gaming to develop policies and procedures that foster responsible gaming practices by gaming facilities in New York state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-20AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-20SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-03-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1978A
2019-03-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-12Senatereturned to senate
2019-03-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-02-11Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering
2019-02-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.63
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A03477 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback