NY A03548 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voiding and rendering unenforceable contract provisions limiting certain speech by contractees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voiding and rendering unenforceable contract provisions limiting certain speech by contractees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.219
2019-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2455A
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.116
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.116
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03349 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S02455 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3548

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03548&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03548&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03548
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03548&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03548&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03548&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03548&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3548#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback