NY A03619 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the duties of the office of children and family services concerning lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender runaway and homeless youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the duties of the office of children and family services concerning lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender runaway and homeless youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11Senatesigned chap.361
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.134
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1481A
2019-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2019-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.402
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyprint number 3619a
2019-05-14Assemblyamend and recommit to children and families
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S01481 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3619A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03619&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03619&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03619
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03619&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03619A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03619&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03619&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3619#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback