NY A03675 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - signed chap.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue standard drivers' licenses and restricts what information can be retained and given out on those applying or holding standard drivers' licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue standard drivers' licenses and restricts what information can be retained and given out on those applying or holding standard drivers' licenses.

Sponsors

Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. David Gantt [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Senatesigned chap.37
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.1466
2019-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1747B
2019-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.118
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.118
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-08Assemblyprint number 3675b
2019-06-08Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-29Assemblyprint number 3675a
2019-05-29Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2019-01-30Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S01747 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3675B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03675
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03675A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03675B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03675&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3675#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback