NY A03732 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a school resource officer program to permit the employment of retired law enforcement officers and provide grants to school districts and non-public schools for such purpose.
Title
Relates to creating a school resource officer program to permit the employment of retired law enforcement officers and provide grants to school districts and non-public schools for such purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07620 (Same As) 2020-01-31 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION