NY A03751 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to mental health services for Medicaid eligible individuals up to 21 years of age who are referred to the pre-admission certification committee; requires commissioner to evaluate what services are needed and how to provide them.
Title
Relates to access to mental health services for Medicaid eligible individuals up to 21 years of age who are referred to the pre-admission certification committee; requires commissioner to evaluate what services are needed and how to provide them.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | print number 3751a |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S00725 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE