NY A03956 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate sexual misconduct in state correctional facilities among incarcerated individuals and employees; devises a reporting system for notification of such misconduct to appropriate authorities; establishes duties and membership of such commission.
Title
Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate sexual misconduct in state correctional facilities among incarcerated individuals and employees; devises a reporting system for notification of such misconduct to appropriate authorities; establishes duties and membership of such commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08879 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO FINANCE