NY A03964 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-12)
Status: Passed on August 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-12 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-12)
Status: Passed on August 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-12 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines for leaving scene of an accident without reporting.
Title
Increases fines for leaving scene of an accident without reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-12 | Assembly | signed chap.497 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1709 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9163 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.528 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09163 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3964