NY S09163 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines for leaving scene of an accident without reporting.
Title
Increases fines for leaving scene of an accident without reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3964 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1709 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03964 (Same As) 2022-08-12 - signed chap.497