NY A03985 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 434 in the county of Tioga as the "Ronald Reagan Memorial Parkway".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 434 in the county of Tioga as the "Ronald Reagan Memorial Parkway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2012-01-12 | Assembly | print number 3985a |
2012-01-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-02-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02751 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - referred to transportation