NY A04060 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires menstrual products in all public college and university buildings.
Title
Requires menstrual products in all public college and university buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 4060a |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.110 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.81 |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | reported |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05910 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5910B